MO HB2381 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-28 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-28 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding mine property
Title
Changes the laws regarding mine property
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-11 - House - House: HB 2381 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 136 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2016-05-11 - House - House: HB 2381 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 137 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-11 - House - House: HB 2381 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 148 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-05-11 - House - House: HB 2381 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 137 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-11 - House - House: HB 2381 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 148 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-28 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2016-06-28 | House | Approved by Governor (G) |
2016-05-25 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2016-05-25 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2016-05-25 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2016-05-11 | House | House Message (H) |
2016-05-11 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 137 NOES: 11 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-05-11 | House | House Adopts (H) - SS as amended AYES: 136 NOES: 11 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-05-11 | House | Taken Up |
2016-05-11 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-05-10 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-05-09 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SS as amended |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1 AYES: 30 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-05-09 | Senate | SS Adopted (S) |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Senate Substitute Offered (S) |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Taken Up |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, April 21, 2016, 9:00 AM, SCR 1 |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Ways and Means(S) |
2016-04-11 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2016-04-11 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 148 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-04-11 | House | Taken Up |
2016-04-06 | House | Perfected (H) |
2016-04-06 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2016-04-06 | House | Taken Up |
2016-04-05 | House | Laid Over (H) |
2016-04-05 | House | Taken Up |
2016-03-15 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-03-10 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-03-10 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-03-02 | House | Referred: Select Committee on State and Local Governments(H) |
2016-03-02 | House | Reported Do Pass with Amendments (H) - HCA 1 AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-03-01 | House | Voted Do Pass with Amendments (H) |
2016-03-01 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-03-01 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-02-24 | House | Referred: Local Government(H) |
2016-01-27 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-26 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |