MO HB2691 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes and modifies provisions relating to child abuse or neglect
Title
Establishes and modifies provisions relating to child abuse or neglect
Sponsors
Rep. Holly Jones [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-03-26 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-02-27 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-02-22 | House | Referred: Children and Families(H) |
2024-02-14 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-02-13 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |