MO HB279 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-27 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Financial Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-27 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Financial Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases, from $15,000 to $125,000, the amount of equity in a homestead that can be exempt from attachment in a bankruptcy proceeding when the person is 62 years of age or older
Title
Increases, from $15,000 to $125,000, the amount of equity in a homestead that can be exempt from attachment in a bankruptcy proceeding when the person is 62 years of age or older
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-27 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-02-02 | Referred: Financial Institutions (H) | |
2011-01-24 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-01-20 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB279&year=2011&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills111/biltxt/intro/HB0279I.htm |