MO HB2835 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Special Committee on Innovation and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Special Committee on Innovation and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes provisions for interactive digital games played on mechanical amusement devices and authorizes sports wagering
Title
Establishes provisions for interactive digital games played on mechanical amusement devices and authorizes sports wagering
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-04-17 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Innovation and Technology(H) |
2024-02-28 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-02-27 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |