MO HB29 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-19 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Pending: Senate Health, Mental Health, Seniors And Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-19 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Pending: Senate Health, Mental Health, Seniors And Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Volunteer Health Services Act which allows a licensed health care provider to render volunteer professional health care services for a sponsoring organization
Title
Establishes the Volunteer Health Services Act which allows a licensed health care provider to render volunteer professional health care services for a sponsoring organization
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-19 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2011-04-18 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) | |
2011-03-31 | Second Read and Referred: Health, Mental Health, Seniors, and Familiest (S) | |
2011-03-28 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2011-03-17 | Third Read and Passed (H) | |
2011-03-14 | Perfected (H) | |
2011-03-14 | HCS Adopted (H) | |
2011-03-09 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2011-03-09 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2011-03-09 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-02-22 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2011-02-22 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2011-02-09 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2011-02-09 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-01-26 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-01-20 | Referred: Health Care Policy (H) | |
2011-01-06 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-01-05 | Read First Time (H) |