MO HB3 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates money for the expenses, grants, refunds, and distributions of the Department of Higher Education.
Title
Appropriates money for the expenses, grants, refunds, and distributions of the Department of Higher Education.
Sponsors
Rep. Cody Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-09 - House - House: HB 3 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 115 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - House: HB 3 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 112 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - House: HB 3 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 107 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - House: HB 3 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 43 N: 110 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House: HB 3 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 108 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House: HB 3 (HA 8) HABs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 42 N: 99 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [FAIL]
2019-05-09 - House - House: HB 3 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 112 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - House: HB 3 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 107 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - House: HB 3 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 43 N: 110 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House: HB 3 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 108 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House: HB 3 (HA 8) HABs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 42 N: 99 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2019-06-10 | House | Approved by Governor (G) |
2019-05-29 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2019-05-29 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2019-05-29 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2019-05-10 | House | Senate Message (S) |
2019-05-09 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2019-05-09 | House | Senate Adopts Conference Committee Report (S) - May 9, 2019 |
2019-05-09 | House | Senate Submits Conference Committee Report (S) - May 9, 2019 |
2019-05-09 | House | House Message (H) |
2019-05-09 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 112 NOES: 38 PRESENT: 1 |
2019-05-09 | House | House Adopts Conference Committee Report (H) - AYES: 115 NOES: 32 PRESENT: 1 |
2019-05-09 | House | House Submits Conference Committee Report (H) |
2019-05-09 | House | House Distributes Conference Committee Report (H) |
2019-05-09 | House | House Message (H) |
2019-05-09 | House | House Conference Committee Appointed (H) - REPRESENTATIVES SMITH, WOOD, BLACK(7), KENDRICK, BURNETT |
2019-05-09 | House | Senate Message (S) |
2019-05-09 | House | Senate Conference Committee Appointed (S) - Senators Hegeman, Sater, Cunningham, Holsman and Rizzo |
2019-05-09 | House | Motion Adopted - Senate grants further conference |
2019-05-09 | House | House Message (H) |
2019-05-09 | House | House Requests a Further Conference (H) |
2019-05-09 | House | House Defeats Conference Committee Report (H) - AYES: 43 NOES: 110 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-05-09 | House | House Submits Conference Committee Report (H) |
2019-05-09 | House | House Message (H) |
2019-05-09 | House | Conferees to Exceed Differences (H) - Section 3.070 |
2019-05-09 | House | Taken Up |
2019-05-08 | House | House Distributes Conference Committee Report (H) |
2019-05-08 | House | Senate Message (S) |
2019-05-08 | House | Conferees to Exceed Differences (S) - Section 3.070 |
2019-04-30 | House | House Message (H) |
2019-04-30 | House | House Conference Committee Appointed (H) - REPRESENTATIVES SMITH, WOOD, BLACK(7), KENDRICK, BURNETT |
2019-04-30 | House | Senate Message (S) |
2019-04-29 | House | Senate Conference Committee Appointed (S) - SENATORS HEGEMAN, HOUGH, CUNNINGHAM, HOLSMAN, NASHEED |
2019-04-29 | House | Senate Refuses to Recede, Grants Conference (S) |
2019-04-29 | House | House Message (H) |
2019-04-29 | House | House Refuses to Adopt, Requests Senate to Recede or Grant Conference |
2019-04-29 | House | Taken Up |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SCS |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Third Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 30 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | SCS Adopted (S) |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Taken Up |
2019-04-23 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2019-04-18 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (S) |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 16, and Wednesday, April 17, 2019, 8:30am, Room 117A |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Friday, April 12, 2019, 8:30am, Room 117A, Mark-Up |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, April 11, 2019, 8:30am, Room 117A, Mark-Up |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 10, 2019, 8:30am, Room 117A, Mark-Up |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 9, 2019, 8:30am, Room 117A |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Second read and referred: Appropriations(S) |
2019-04-01 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2019-03-28 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) |
2019-03-28 | House | Taken Up |
2019-03-26 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2, HA 3, HA 4, HA 5, HA 6, HA 7 adopted |
2019-03-26 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2019-03-26 | House | Taken Up |
2019-03-26 | House | Laid Over (H) |
2019-03-26 | House | Taken Up |
2019-03-26 | House | Laid Over (H) |
2019-03-26 | House | Taken Up |
2019-03-26 | House | Laid Over (H) |
2019-03-26 | House | Taken Up |
2019-03-26 | House | Laid Over (H) |
2019-03-26 | House | Taken Up |
2019-03-26 | House | Laid Over (H) |
2019-03-26 | House | Taken Up |
2019-03-26 | House | Laid Over (H) |
2019-03-26 | House | Taken Up |
2019-03-25 | House | Laid Over (H) |
2019-03-25 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2019-03-25 | House | Taken Up |
2019-03-13 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - Six hours total debate on perfection AYES: 25 NOES: 9 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-03-11 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-03-11 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred: Budget(H) |
2019-02-06 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-02-05 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |