MO HB306 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-20 - Third Read and Defeated (H) - AYES: 60 NOES: 82 PRESENT: 4
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-20 - Third Read and Defeated (H) - AYES: 60 NOES: 82 PRESENT: 4
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Enacts a regulatory scheme for weigh station and inspection site bypass services
Title
Enacts a regulatory scheme for weigh station and inspection site bypass services
Sponsors
Rep. T.J. Berry [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-20 - House - House: HB 306 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 60 N: 82 NV: 4 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-20 | House | Third Read and Defeated (H) - AYES: 60 NOES: 82 PRESENT: 4 |
2017-04-20 | House | Taken Up |
2017-04-12 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2 adopted |
2017-04-12 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2017-04-12 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2017-04-12 | House | Taken Up |
2017-03-02 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-03-01 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-03-01 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-02-16 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2017-02-16 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-02-15 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-02-15 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-01-25 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-01-12 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Innovation and Technology(H) |
2017-01-05 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-01-04 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2016-12-21 | House | Prefiled (H) |