MO HB373 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-17 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-17 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Grants the authority to redraw the circuit and appellate judicial districts every 10 years to the Supreme Court
Title
Grants the authority to redraw the circuit and appellate judicial districts every 10 years to the Supreme Court
Sponsors
Rep. Stanley Cox [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 24, 2013, Upon Adjournment, Senate Lounge |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled (S) - Monday, April 22, 2013 cancelled. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, April 22, 2013, Upon Evening Recess or Adjournment, Senate Lounge |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence(S) |
2013-04-15 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2013-04-15 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 95 NOES: 55 |
2013-04-15 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2013-04-10 | House | Perfected (H) |
2013-04-10 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2013-04-10 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2013-03-28 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) |
2013-03-28 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) |
2013-03-28 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-03-06 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2013-03-06 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2013-03-06 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2013-03-06 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-02-20 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2013-02-06 | House | Referred: Judiciary(H) |
2013-01-31 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2013-01-30 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |