MO HB452 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-30 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-30 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies definitions of "employee" and "physician employee" in actions against health care providers for personal injury or death
Title
Modifies definitions of "employee" and "physician employee" in actions against health care providers for personal injury or death
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-12 - House - House: HB 452 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 99 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - House - House: HB 452 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 98 N: 45 NV: 1 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - House: HB 452 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 102 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - House: HB 452 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 101 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House: HB 452 (*HA 3) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 19 N: 94 NV: 32 Abs: 17) [FAIL]
2017-05-12 - House - House: HB 452 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 98 N: 45 NV: 1 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - House: HB 452 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 102 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - House: HB 452 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 101 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House: HB 452 (*HA 3) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 19 N: 94 NV: 32 Abs: 17) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-30 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2017-06-30 | House | Approved by Governor (G) |
2017-05-22 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2017-05-22 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2017-05-22 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2017-05-12 | House | House Message (H) |
2017-05-12 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 98 NOES: 45 PRESENT: 1 |
2017-05-12 | House | House Adopts (H) - SS as amended AYES: 99 NOES: 44 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-05-12 | House | Taken Up |
2017-05-12 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-05-12 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-05-12 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-05-11 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SS as amended |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Third Read and Passed (S) |
2017-05-11 | Senate | SS Adopted (S) |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Senate Substitute Offered (S) |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Taken Up |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar - SA 1 pending |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Taken Up |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Wednesday, April 12, 2017, 8:00am, SCR 1 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 5, 2017, 8:00am, SCR 1 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Government Reform(S) |
2017-03-16 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2017-03-16 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 101 NOES: 50 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-03-16 | House | Taken Up |
2017-03-14 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted |
2017-03-14 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2017-03-14 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2017-03-14 | House | Taken Up |
2017-02-20 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-02-20 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-02-20 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-02-15 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2017-02-15 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-02-13 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-02-13 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-02-06 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Litigation Reform(H) |
2017-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-01-05 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |