MO HB478 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-05 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-05 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies that school teacher and employee retirement allowances must not exceed 2.55% of the member's final average salary for each year of service if the member's service is 31 years or more
Title
Specifies that school teacher and employee retirement allowances must not exceed 2.55% of the member's final average salary for each year of service if the member's service is 31 years or more
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - House - HB 478 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 50 NV: 3 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - House - HB 478 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 117 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - HB 478 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 109 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - House - HB 478 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 117 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - HB 478 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 109 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-05 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Wednesday, April 22. 2015, 2:00pm, Senate Lounge |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 15, 2015, 2:00pm, Senate Lounge |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Education(S) |
2015-04-06 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2015-04-02 | House | Emergency Clause Defeated (H) - AYES: 94 NOES: 50 PRESENT: 3 |
2015-04-02 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 117 NOES: 27 PRESENT: 2 |
2015-04-02 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2015-04-01 | House | Perfected (H) |
2015-04-01 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2015-04-01 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2015-02-26 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2015-02-26 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-02-26 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-02-24 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Financial Institutions and Taxation(H) |
2015-02-24 | House | Reported Do Pass with Amendments (H) - HCA 1 AYES: 9 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-02-24 | House | Voted Do Pass with Amendments (H) |
2015-02-24 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-02-10 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-01-29 | House | Referred: Pensions(H) |
2015-01-14 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-01-13 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |