MO HB515 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-05 - Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-05 - Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Science, Technology, Engineering, and Mathematics (STEM) Grant program for Access Missouri Financial Assistance Program award recipients
Title
Establishes the Science, Technology, Engineering, and Mathematics (STEM) Grant program for Access Missouri Financial Assistance Program award recipients
Sponsors
Rep. Don Mayhew [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | House | Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules (H) |
2023-04-19 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2023-04-17 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2023-04-17 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2023-04-17 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2023-04-12 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2023-03-30 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2023-03-29 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2023-03-29 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2023-02-15 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2023-02-09 | House | Referred: Higher Education(H) |
2023-01-05 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2023-01-04 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2022-12-28 | House | Prefiled (H) |