MO HB573 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-19 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Health Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-19 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Health Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires every health carrier to file all of its health insurance premium rate information with the Department of Insurance, Financial Institutions and Professional Registration before applying the rate
Title
Requires every health carrier to file all of its health insurance premium rate information with the Department of Insurance, Financial Institutions and Professional Registration before applying the rate
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-19 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-02-24 | Referred: Health Insurance (H) | |
2011-02-21 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-02-17 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB573&year=2011&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills111/biltxt/intro/HB0573I.htm |