MO HB645 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-20 - Motion to Do Pass Failed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-20 - Motion to Do Pass Failed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes a city or county to impose, upon voter approval, an additional tax of up to 75 cents per month on alternative telecommunications connections for 911 emergency telephone service
Title
Authorizes a city or county to impose, upon voter approval, an additional tax of up to 75 cents per month on alternative telecommunications connections for 911 emergency telephone service
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-20 | Motion to Do Pass Failed (H) | |
2011-04-20 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-04-06 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-03-31 | Referred: Local Government (H) | |
2011-02-24 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-02-23 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB645&year=2011&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills111/biltxt/intro/HB0645I.htm |