MO HB733 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-17 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-17 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding the Port Improvement District Act
Title
Changes the laws regarding the Port Improvement District Act
Sponsors
Rep. T.J. Berry [R] | Rep. Gary Cross [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, May 1, 2013, 12:00 p.m. or Upon Morning Recess, Senate Lounge. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Jobs, Economic Development, and Local Government(S) |
2013-04-22 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2013-04-18 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 144 NOES: 3 |
2013-04-18 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2013-04-17 | House | Perfected (H) |
2013-04-17 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2013-03-28 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass - not Consent (H) |
2013-03-28 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass - not Consent (H) |
2013-03-28 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-03-14 | House | Rules - No Action Taken (H) |
2013-03-14 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-03-14 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2013-03-14 | House | Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) |
2013-03-13 | House | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2013-03-13 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-03-13 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred: International Trade(H) |
2013-02-28 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2013-02-27 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |