MO HB739 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-27 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-27 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the Amber Alert System to include missing endangered adults, specifies the criteria for being a missing endangered adult, and changes the system's name to Amber Alert and Silver Alert System
Title
Expands the Amber Alert System to include missing endangered adults, specifies the criteria for being a missing endangered adult, and changes the system's name to Amber Alert and Silver Alert System
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-27 | Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2011-03-30 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-03-16 | Referred: Children and Families (H) | |
2011-03-03 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-03-02 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB739&year=2011&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills111/biltxt/intro/HB0739I.htm |