MO HB891 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-21 - Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H)
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-21 - Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H)
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes an income tax deduction from a taxpayer's Missouri adjusted gross income for all income earned as a temporary election staff member
Title
Authorizes an income tax deduction from a taxpayer's Missouri adjusted gross income for all income earned as a temporary election staff member
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-21 | Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H) | |
2011-04-07 | Referred: Ways and Means (H) | |
2011-03-18 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-03-17 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB891&year=2011&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills111/biltxt/intro/HB0891I.htm |