MO HB90 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Conference Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Conference Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Narcotics Control Act
Title
Establishes the Narcotics Control Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-03 - House - House: HB 90 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 112 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House: HB 90 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 102 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House: HB 90 (*HA 2, A.A.) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 111 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House: HB 90 (*HA 2, A.A.) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 68 N: 86 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2017-03-29 - House - House: HB 90 (HA 4) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 105 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House: HB 90 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 109 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House: HB 90 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 102 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House: HB 90 (*HA 2, A.A.) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 111 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House: HB 90 (*HA 2, A.A.) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 68 N: 86 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2017-03-29 - House - House: HB 90 (HA 4) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 105 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House: HB 90 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 109 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-05-12 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-05-11 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2017-05-11 | House | House Distributes Conference Committee Report (H) |
2017-05-11 | House | Conferees Re-appointed (H) - REPRESENTATIVES REHDER, ENGLER, MORRIS, QUADE, WESSELS |
2017-05-11 | House | Senate Message (S) |
2017-05-11 | House | Senate Conference Committee Appointed (S) - SENATORS SCHATZ, KRAUS, SATER, HUMMEL, WALSH |
2017-05-11 | House | House Message (H) |
2017-05-11 | House | Senate Message (S) |
2017-05-11 | House | Senate Grants Conference (S) |
2017-05-11 | House | House Message (H) |
2017-05-11 | House | House Requests a Further Conference (H) |
2017-05-11 | House | Taken Up |
2017-05-09 | House | Laid Over (H) |
2017-05-09 | House | Conference Committee Dissolved |
2017-05-09 | House | Taken Up |
2017-05-09 | House | House Message (H) |
2017-05-08 | House | House Conference Committee Appointed (H) - REPRESENTATIVES REHDER, ENGLER, MORRIS, QUADE, WESSELS |
2017-05-08 | House | Senate Message (S) |
2017-05-08 | House | Senate Conference Committee Appointed (S) - SCHATZ, KRAUS, SATER, SCHUPP, HUMMEL |
2017-05-08 | House | Senate Refuses to Recede, Grants Conference (S) |
2017-04-18 | House | House Message (H) |
2017-04-18 | House | House Refuses to Adopt, Requests Senate to Recede or Grant Conference - SS as amended |
2017-04-18 | House | Taken Up |
2017-04-18 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-04-18 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-04-18 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-04-18 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SS as amended |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1 to SA 2, SA 2 as amended, SSA 1 for SA 3, SA 5, SA 6, SA 7, adopted |
2017-04-13 | Senate | SS Adopted (S) |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Senate Substitute Offered (S) |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Taken Up |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, April 13, 2017, 8:15am, Bingham Conference Room |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Referred: Senate Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, April 6, 2017, 8:00am, Senate Lounge |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Transportation, Infrastructure, and Public Safety(S) |
2017-04-03 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2017-04-03 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 102 NOES: 54 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-04-03 | House | Taken Up |
2017-04-03 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-04-03 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-04-03 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-03-30 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2017-03-29 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted |
2017-03-29 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2017-03-29 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2017-03-29 | House | Taken Up |
2017-03-29 | House | Laid Over (H) - HA 1/HCS pending |
2017-03-29 | House | Taken Up |
2017-03-28 | House | Laid Over (H) |
2017-03-28 | House | Taken Up |
2017-02-20 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-02-20 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-02-20 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-02-15 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2017-02-15 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-02-14 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-02-14 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-02-07 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-01-31 | House | Referred: Insurance Policy(H) |
2017-01-05 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-01-04 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2016-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |