MO HB907 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-20 - Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H)
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-20 - Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H)
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the school board of the Columbia Public School District to impose, upon voter approval, an additional annual real property tax to fund ealy childhood education programs
Title
Authorizes the school board of the Columbia Public School District to impose, upon voter approval, an additional annual real property tax to fund ealy childhood education programs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-20 | Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H) | |
2011-04-12 | Referred: Local Government (H) | |
2011-03-29 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-03-28 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB907&year=2011&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills111/biltxt/intro/HB0907I.htm |