MO HB926 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to dealer license plates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to dealer license plates.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-24 - House - House: HB 926 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 143 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House: HB 926 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 140 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House: HB 926 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 148 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-09HouseDelivered to Secretary of State (G)
2019-07-09HouseApproved by Governor (G)
2019-05-29HouseDelivered to Governor
2019-05-29HouseSigned by President Pro Tem (S)
2019-05-29HouseSigned by House Speaker(H)
2019-04-24HouseHouse Message (H)
2019-04-24HouseTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed
2019-04-24HouseHouse Adopts (H) - SCS
2019-04-24HouseTaken Up
2019-04-24HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2019-04-24HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2019-04-24HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-04-23HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2019-04-23SenateReported to the House with... (H) - SCS
2019-04-18SenateThird Read and Passed (S)
2019-04-18SenateSCS Adopted (S)
2019-04-18SenateTaken Up
2019-04-11SenateSCS Reported Do Pass-Placed on 3rd Read Consent Calendar (S)
2019-04-11SenateSCS Voted Do Pass Consent (S)
2019-04-11SenateExecutive Session Held (S)
2019-04-04SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2019-04-02SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, April 4, 2019, 8:20am, Senate Lounge
2019-03-26SenateSecond read and referred: Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety(S)
2019-03-14HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2019-03-14HouseThird Read and Passed (H)
2019-03-14HouseTaken Up
2019-03-12HousePerfected (H)
2019-03-12HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2019-03-12HouseTaken Up
2019-03-06HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2019-03-05HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2019-03-05HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-02-28HouseReferred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
2019-02-28HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
2019-02-28HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2019-02-28HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-02-21HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2019-02-14HouseReferred: Transportation(H)
2019-02-14HouseRead Second Time (H)
2019-02-13HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback