MO HCB2 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-13 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-13 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to highway naming
Title
Modifies provisions relating to highway naming
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-13 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-04-13 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-04-13 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-04-13 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-04-05 | House | Executive Session Scheduled - Bill Not Heard |
2017-03-30 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2017-03-30 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-03-29 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
2017-03-29 | House | Reported for Introduction (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-03-29 | House | Voted to Introduce (H) |
2017-03-29 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-03-15 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2017-03-15 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2017-03-08 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-03-01 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-02-23 | House | Authorized - Delivered to Committee on Transportation |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HCB2&year=2017&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills171/hlrbillspdf/2151H.01I.pdf |