MO HCR38 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-14 - Adopted (H) - AYES: 130 NOES: 23
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urgently requests the United States Congress to cease and desist from imposing unfunded mandates on the states

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urgently requests the United States Congress to cease and desist from imposing unfunded mandates on the states

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-14 Adopted (H) - AYES: 130 NOES: 23
2010-05-14 House Concurs (H) - SCA 1 ADOPTED AYES: 130 NOES: 23
2010-05-05 Reported to the House with... (S) - SCA 1
2010-05-05 Adopted (S) - SCA 1 ADOPTED YEAS: 30 NAYS: 2
2010-03-16 Reported Do Pass with Amendments (S) - SCA 1
2010-02-16 Referred: Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics (S)
2010-02-15 Reported to The Senate (S)
2010-02-11 Adopted (H) - AYES: 38 NOES: 16 PRESENT: 0
2010-02-01 Rules - Reported Do Pass (H)
2010-02-01 Rules - Voted Do Pass (H)
2010-02-01 Rules - Executive Session Completed (H)
2010-01-27 Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H)
2010-01-27 Reported Do Pass (H)
2010-01-27 Voted Do Pass (H)
2010-01-27 Executive Session Completed (H)
2010-01-27 Public Hearing Completed (H)
2010-01-25 Referred: Budget (H)
2010-01-21 Offered (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback