MO HCR57 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-09 - Rules - Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-09 - Rules - Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Realignment of Political Subdivisions to evaluate the fiscal benefit of realigning the distribution of public fiscal, capital, and personnel resources
Title
Establishes the Committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Realignment of Political Subdivisions to evaluate the fiscal benefit of realigning the distribution of public fiscal, capital, and personnel resources
Sponsors
Rep. Cole McNary [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-09 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-05-02 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2012-05-02 | Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-05-01 | Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-05-01 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-04-26 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-04-18 | Referred: Downsizing State Government (H) | |
2012-04-11 | Offered (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HCR57&year=2012&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills121/biltxt/intro/HCR0057I.htm |