MO HCR60 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Referred: Rules - Regulatory Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Regulatory Oversight Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 12:00 pm in House Hearing Room 4 (Executive Session)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Referred: Rules - Regulatory Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Regulatory Oversight Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 12:00 pm in House Hearing Room 4 (Executive Session)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Urges state retirement funds to investigate expanding to bitcoin and other digital currencies
Title
Urges state retirement funds to investigate expanding to bitcoin and other digital currencies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | Referred: Rules - Regulatory Oversight(H) |
2024-04-23 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 1 |
2024-04-17 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-04-17 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-04-10 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-04-08 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Innovation and Technology(H) |
2024-02-28 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-02-27 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |