MO HCR70 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-05 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-05 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Declares youth violence as a public health epidemic and declares June 7th as "Christopher Harris Day" in Missouri
Title
Declares youth violence as a public health epidemic and declares June 7th as "Christopher Harris Day" in Missouri
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - House - House: HCR 70 HCRs FOR THIRD READING-INFORMAL (Y: 113 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 33) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - House - House: HCR 70 HCRs FOR THIRD READING-INFORMAL (Y: 113 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 33) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-05 | Senate | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2018-07-05 | Senate | Approved by Governor (G) |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate Message (S) |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 29 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Taken Up |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Thursday, April 26, 2018, 9:40am, Pershing Conference Room |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 24, 2018, 9:00am, Senate Lounge |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions, and Ethics(S) |
2018-04-11 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2018-04-10 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 113 NOES: 15 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-04-10 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To - AYES: 113 NOES: 15 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-04-10 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-03-06 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-03-05 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-03-05 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-02-27 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2018-02-27 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-02-27 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-02-27 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-02-13 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-01-31 | House | Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety(H) |
2018-01-22 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-18 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |