MO HJR16 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-13 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-13 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes a constitutional amendment changing the number of voter signatures that are required to place an initiative petition or a referendum on a ballot
Title
Proposes a constitutional amendment changing the number of voter signatures that are required to place an initiative petition or a referendum on a ballot
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-13 | Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2011-05-13 | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) | |
2011-05-13 | Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2011-05-12 | Referred: Ways and Means and Fiscal Oversight (S) | |
2011-05-12 | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2011-05-09 | Executive Session Held (S) | |
2011-05-05 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2011-05-05 | Second Read and Referred: Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections (S) | |
2011-05-02 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2011-04-28 | Third Read and Passed (H) | |
2011-04-28 | Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2011-04-28 | Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2011-04-28 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-04-27 | Referred: Fiscal Review (H) | |
2011-04-26 | Perfected (H) | |
2011-04-26 | HCS Adopted (H) | |
2011-04-20 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2011-04-20 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2011-04-20 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-04-14 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2011-04-14 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2011-03-01 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2011-03-01 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-02-22 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-02-10 | Referred: Elections (H) | |
2011-02-01 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-01-31 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |