MO HJR34 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-19 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-19 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes a constitutional amendment prohibiting anyone elected to the General Assembly after November 1, 2008, from serving more than 12 years in any one house nor more than 24 years total in both houses
Title
Proposes a constitutional amendment prohibiting anyone elected to the General Assembly after November 1, 2008, from serving more than 12 years in any one house nor more than 24 years total in both houses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-19 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-04-12 | Referred: Elections (H) | |
2011-03-02 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-03-01 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HJR34&year=2011&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills111/biltxt/intro/HJR0034I.htm |