MO HJR60 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-14 - Referred: Veterans (H)
Pending: House Veterans Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-14 - Referred: Veterans (H)
Pending: House Veterans Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes a constitutional amendment authorizing an exemption from personal property tax for one motor vehicle owned by or leased to a veteran awarded the Purple Heart medal or the surviving, unwed spouse
Title
Proposes a constitutional amendment authorizing an exemption from personal property tax for one motor vehicle owned by or leased to a veteran awarded the Purple Heart medal or the surviving, unwed spouse
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-14 | Referred: Veterans (H) | |
2010-01-07 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2010-01-06 | Read First Time (H) | |
2009-12-21 | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HJR60&year=2010&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills101/biltxt/intro/HJR0060I.htm |