MO HJR86 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-13 - Placed on Informal Calendar - SCS, SS#4/SCS PENDING
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-13 - Placed on Informal Calendar - SCS, SS#4/SCS PENDING
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes a constitutional amendment affirming the right to raise animals in a humane manner in order to protect Missouri's agricultural economy
Title
Proposes a constitutional amendment affirming the right to raise animals in a humane manner in order to protect Missouri's agricultural economy
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Loehner [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-13 | Placed on Informal Calendar - SCS, SS#4/SCS PENDING | |
2010-05-13 | Senate Substitute Offered (S) - SS#4 | |
2010-05-13 | SS Withdrawn (S) | |
2010-05-13 | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) | |
2010-05-12 | Placed on Informal Calendar - SCS, SS#3/SCS, SA 1 PENDING | |
2010-05-12 | Senate Substitute Offered (S) - SS#3 | |
2010-05-12 | SS Withdrawn (S) | |
2010-05-12 | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) | |
2010-05-11 | Placed on Informal Calendar - SCS, SS#2/SCS PENDING | |
2010-05-11 | Senate Substitute Offered (S) - SS#2 | |
2010-05-11 | SS Withdrawn (S) | |
2010-05-11 | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) | |
2010-04-19 | Placed on Informal Calendar - SCS, SS PENDING | |
2010-04-19 | Senate Substitute Offered (S) | |
2010-04-19 | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) | |
2010-04-15 | Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2010-04-07 | Referred: Governmental Accountability and Fisc Oversight (S) | |
2010-04-01 | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2010-04-01 | Executive Session Held (S) | |
2010-03-24 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2010-03-22 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - WEDNESDAY, MARCH 24, 2010, 12:00P.M., SENATE COMMITTEE ROOM 1 | |
2010-03-18 | Second Read and Referred: Agriculture, Food Production, and Outdoor Resources (S) | |
2010-03-04 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2010-03-04 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 96 NOES: 52 PRESENT: 1 | |
2010-03-03 | Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2010-03-03 | Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2010-03-03 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-03-03 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2010-03-02 | Referred: Fiscal Review (H) | |
2010-03-01 | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 2 TO HA 1, HA 1 AS AMENDED, HA 2 ADOPTED | |
2010-03-01 | HCS Adopted (H) | |
2010-02-22 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2010-02-22 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2010-02-22 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-02-18 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2010-02-18 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2010-02-18 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2010-02-18 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-02-11 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2010-02-03 | Referred: Agriculture Policy (H) | |
2010-01-27 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2010-01-26 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |