MO HR222 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Adopted (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Adopted (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the House of Representatives to employ such employees necessary between May 17, 2013 and January 8, 2014 to perform the duties of the House
Title
Allows the House of Representatives to employ such employees necessary between May 17, 2013 and January 8, 2014 to perform the duties of the House
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-15 | House | Adopted (H) |
2013-05-02 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) |
2013-05-02 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) |
2013-05-02 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-04-29 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2013-04-29 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) |
2013-02-06 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2013-02-06 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-02-06 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2013-01-31 | House | Referred: Administration and Accounts(H) |
2013-01-28 | House | Offered (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HR222&year=2013&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills131/biltxt/intro/HR0222I.htm |