MO HR3158 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-16 - Approved (H)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-16 - Approved (H)
Summary
Grants the Silver Haired Legislature use of the House Chamber on Thursday, October 11, 2012, from 8 am to 4 pm and Friday, October 12, 2012, from 8 am to noon
Title
Grants the Silver Haired Legislature use of the House Chamber on Thursday, October 11, 2012, from 8 am to 4 pm and Friday, October 12, 2012, from 8 am to noon
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-16 | Approved (H) | |
2012-05-14 | Offered (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HR3158&year=2012&code=R |