MO HR4596 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-11 - Adopted (H) - AYES: 140 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 2
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-11 - Adopted (H) - AYES: 140 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 2
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Endorses continued support of the relationship and shared interests between Taiwan and the State of Missouri
Title
Endorses continued support of the relationship and shared interests between Taiwan and the State of Missouri
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Lynch [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-05-11 - House - House: HR 4596 HOUSE RESOLUTIONS (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-11 | House | Adopted (H) - AYES: 140 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 2 |
2020-05-11 | House | Taken Up |
2020-02-25 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-02-18 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-02-18 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-02-12 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2020-02-12 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-02-11 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-02-11 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-02-04 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2020-01-30 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Homeland Security(H) |
2020-01-15 | House | Offered (H) |