MO HR900 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-03 - Executive Session - No Action Taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-03 - Executive Session - No Action Taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes a House Rule change imposing a fine for each legislative day a member removes himself or herself from the state for the purpose of avoiding any official duty or vote
Title
Proposes a House Rule change imposing a fine for each legislative day a member removes himself or herself from the state for the purpose of avoiding any official duty or vote
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-03 | Executive Session - No Action Taken | |
2011-04-27 | Executive Session - No Action Taken | |
2011-04-20 | Executive Session - No Action Taken | |
2011-04-14 | Executive Session - No Action Taken | |
2011-04-11 | Executive Session - No Action Taken | |
2011-04-06 | Executive Session - No Action Taken | |
2011-03-09 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-03-03 | Referred: Rules (H) | |
2011-03-03 | Offered (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HR900&year=2011&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills111/biltxt/intro/HR0900I.htm |