MO SB1002 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the State Auditor to audit community improvement districts
Title
Allows the State Auditor to audit community improvement districts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-10 - House - House: SB 1002 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 153 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-29 | House | Signed by Governor |
2016-05-25 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2016-05-25 | House | Signed by House Speaker |
2016-05-25 | House | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2016-05-25 | House | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2016-05-10 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2016-05-10 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2016-05-04 | House | Reported Do Pass H Government Oversight and Accountability |
2016-05-04 | House | Voted Do Pass H Government Oversight and Accountability |
2016-05-03 | House | Hearing Conducted H Government Oversight and Accountability |
2016-04-19 | House | Referred H Government Oversight and Accountability |
2016-04-19 | House | H Second Read |
2016-04-18 | House | H First Read |
2016-04-14 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Perfected |
2016-04-11 | Senate | SA 1 S offered & defeated (Pearce)--(6280S01.02S) |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Reported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2016-02-01 | Senate | S First Read--SB 1002-Hegeman |