MO SB1057 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-14 - S Formal Calendar S Bills for Third Reading--SS for SB 1057-Shields (In Fiscal Oversight)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-14 - S Formal Calendar S Bills for Third Reading--SS for SB 1057-Shields (In Fiscal Oversight)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Reorganizes certain entities, divisions and departments within state government
Title
Reorganizes certain entities, divisions and departments within state government
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-14 | S Formal Calendar S Bills for Third Reading--SS for SB 1057-Shields (In Fiscal Oversight) | |
2010-04-29 | Hearing Conducted S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee | |
2010-04-14 | Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee | |
2010-04-14 | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee | |
2010-04-13 | Perfected | |
2010-04-13 | SS, as amended, S adopted | |
2010-04-13 | SA 4 to SS S offered & adopted (Bray)--(5300S04.04S) | |
2010-04-13 | SA 3 to SS S offered & adopted (Crowell)--(5300S04.06S) | |
2010-04-13 | SA 2 to SS S offered & adopted (Rupp)--(5300S04.01S) | |
2010-04-13 | SA 1 to SS S offered & adopted (Shields)--(5300S04.02S) | |
2010-04-13 | SS S offered (Shields)--(5300S.04F) | |
2010-04-08 | Reported from S General Laws Committee to Floor | |
2010-04-07 | Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee | |
2010-04-07 | Hearing Conducted S General Laws Committee | |
2010-03-04 | Second Read and Referred S General Laws Committee | |
2010-03-01 | S First Read--SB 1057-Shields |