MO SB113 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-15 - H Calendar S Bills for Third Reading w/HCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-15 - H Calendar S Bills for Third Reading w/HCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to education
Title
Modifies provisions relating to education
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Dixon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-15 | House | H Calendar S Bills for Third Reading w/HCS |
2015-05-14 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2015-05-14 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2015-05-13 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2015-05-12 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on General Laws (Pursuant to H Rule 27.7) |
2015-05-11 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on General Laws (Pursuant to H Rule 27.7) |
2015-05-06 | House | Executive Session Continued - Action Postponed |
2015-05-05 | House | Referred H Select Committee on General Laws (Pursuant to H Rule 27.7) |
2015-05-05 | House | Reported Do Pass H Emerging Issues w/HCA 1, HCA 2 & HCA 3 |
2015-05-04 | House | Voted Do Pass H Emerging Issues w/Amendments |
2015-04-29 | House | Hearing Conducted H Emerging Issues |
2015-04-27 | House | Referred H Emerging Issues |
2015-03-02 | House | H Second Read |
2015-02-26 | House | H First Read |
2015-02-26 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed - Consent |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Reported from S Education Committee to Floor - Consent |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Education Committee - Consent |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee |
2015-01-07 | Senate | S First Read--SB 113-Dixon |
2014-12-03 | Senate | Prefiled |