MO SB142 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-17 - Referred H Judiciary Committee
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-17 - Referred H Judiciary Committee
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals a provision requiring corporate paid-in surplus distributions to be identified as liquidating dividends
Title
Repeals a provision requiring corporate paid-in surplus distributions to be identified as liquidating dividends
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-17 | House | Referred H Judiciary Committee |
2013-04-08 | House | H Second Read |
2013-04-04 | House | H First Read |
2013-04-04 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Perfected |
2013-04-03 | Senate | SA 1 S offered & adopted (Sifton)--(0827S01.01S) |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Reported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee to Floor |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Removed S Consent Calendar |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Reported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee to Floor - Consent |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee - Consent |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2013-01-16 | Senate | S First Read--SB 142-Sifton |