MO SB211 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-15 - H Calendar S Bills for Third Reading w/HCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-15 - H Calendar S Bills for Third Reading w/HCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to participants in the address confidentiality program administered by the Secretary of State
Title
Modifies provisions relating to participants in the address confidentiality program administered by the Secretary of State
Sponsors
Sen. Gina Walsh [D] | Sen. Bob Dixon [R] | Rep. Robert Cornejo [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-15 | House | H Calendar S Bills for Third Reading w/HCS |
2015-05-13 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on Judiciary (Pursuant to H Rule 27.9) |
2015-05-11 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on Judiciary (Pursuant to H Rule 27.9) |
2015-05-07 | House | Referred H Select Committee on Judiciary (Pursuant to H Rule 27.9) |
2015-05-07 | House | Reported Do Pass H Civil and Criminal Proceedings |
2015-05-06 | House | Voted Do Pass H Civil and Criminal Proceedings |
2015-05-06 | House | Hearing Conducted H Civil and Criminal Proceedings |
2015-04-13 | House | Referred H Civil and Criminal Proceedings Committee |
2015-03-16 | House | H Second Read |
2015-03-12 | House | H First Read |
2015-03-12 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed - Consent |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Reported from S Seniors, Families and Children Committee to Floor - Consent |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Seniors, Families and Children Committee - Consent vote adopted |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2015-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 211-Walsh and Dixon |