MO SB251 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 251-Kehoe, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 251-Kehoe, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Division of State Parks to maintain the fence coinciding with the boundary between individual landowner property and the historic Missouri Rock Island Railroad Corridor
Title
Requires the Division of State Parks to maintain the fence coinciding with the boundary between individual landowner property and the historic Missouri Rock Island Railroad Corridor
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Kehoe [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | Senate | Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 251-Kehoe, with SCS |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Reported from S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee w/SCS |
2017-02-13 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee (0815S.03C) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Re-referred S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee |
2017-01-05 | Senate | S First Read--SB 251-Kehoe |