MO SB254 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Raises the fees a lender can charge for certain loans
Title
Raises the fees a lender can charge for certain loans
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-12 | House | Signed by Governor |
2013-05-22 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2013-05-22 | House | Signed by House Speaker |
2013-05-22 | House | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2013-05-22 | House | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee |
2013-05-01 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2013-05-01 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2013-04-23 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2013-04-23 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2013-04-17 | House | Referred to H Rules Committee |
2013-04-17 | House | Reported Do Pass H Financial Institutions Committee |
2013-04-17 | House | Voted Do Pass H Financial Institutions Committee |
2013-04-17 | House | Hearing Conducted H Financial Institutions Committee |
2013-04-10 | House | Referred H Financial Institutions Committee |
2013-04-08 | House | H Second Read |
2013-04-04 | House | H First Read |
2013-04-04 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Perfected |
2013-04-03 | Senate | SCS, as amended, S adopted |
2013-04-03 | Senate | SA 2 to SCS S offered & defeated (Rupp)--(1380S02.04S) |
2013-04-03 | Senate | SA 1 to SCS S offered & adopted (Schaaf)--(1380S02.05S) |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Reported from S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee to Floor w/SCS |
2013-03-11 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee - (1380S.02C) |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee |
2013-02-04 | Senate | S First Read--SB 254-Pearce |