MO SB326 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - S Bills with H Amendments--SB 326-Kraus, with HCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - S Bills with H Amendments--SB 326-Kraus, with HCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creates new provisions relating to low-profit limited liability corporations
Title
Creates new provisions relating to low-profit limited liability corporations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-12 - House - House: SB 326 (HA 1) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - House - House: SB 326 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 147 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - House - House: SB 326 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 147 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | House | S Bills with H Amendments--SB 326-Kraus, with HCS |
2017-05-12 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2017-05-12 | House | HCS H adopted |
2017-05-12 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered & defeated (Lauer)--(1495H03.06H) |
2017-05-10 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2017-05-10 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2017-04-27 | House | Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2017-04-27 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H General Laws |
2017-04-25 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H General Laws |
2017-04-18 | House | Hearing Conducted H General Laws |
2017-04-11 | House | Referred H General Laws |
2017-03-06 | House | H Second Read |
2017-03-02 | House | H First Read |
2017-03-01 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed - Consent |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reported from S Ways and Means Committee - Consent |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Ways and Means Committee - Consent vote adopted |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee |
2017-01-23 | Senate | S First Read--SB 326-Kraus |