MO SB328 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-15 - In Conference--SCS for SB 328-Schupp, with HA 1 & HA 2
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-15 - In Conference--SCS for SB 328-Schupp, with HA 1 & HA 2
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to mental health
Title
Modifies provisions relating to mental health
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Schupp [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-15 | House | In Conference--SCS for SB 328-Schupp, with HA 1 & HA 2 |
2015-05-13 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2015-05-13 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2015-05-12 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2015-05-12 | House | H distributes CCR (0678S06.1SR) |
2015-05-07 | House | S conferees appointed: Schupp, Brown, Riddle, Onder, Walsh |
2015-05-07 | House | H conferees appointed: Lauer, Frederick, Rowland, Morgan, Arthur |
2015-05-07 | House | H refuses to recede and grants conference |
2015-05-06 | House | S requests H recede or grant conference |
2015-05-06 | House | S refuses to concur in HAs 1 & 2 |
2015-05-06 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2015-05-06 | House | HA 2 H offered & adopted (Allen)--(0678S05.13H) |
2015-05-06 | House | HA 1 H offered & adopted (Frederick)--(0678S05.13H) |
2015-04-30 | House | Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on Education (Pursuant to H Rule 27.5) |
2015-04-30 | House | Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on Education (Pursuant to H Rule 27.5) |
2015-04-27 | House | Referred H Select Committee on Education (Pursuant to H Rule 27.5) |
2015-04-27 | House | Reported Do Pass H Emerging Issues in Education |
2015-04-27 | House | Voted Do Pass H Emerging Issues in Education |
2015-04-27 | House | Hearing Conducted H Emerging Issues in Education |
2015-04-20 | House | Referred H Emerging Issues in Education Committee |
2015-04-20 | House | H Second Read |
2015-04-16 | House | H First Read |
2015-04-16 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Perfected |
2015-04-13 | Senate | SCS S adopted |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Reported from S Education Committee to Floor w/SCS |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Motion to Pass Bill Consent FAILED S Education Committee |
2015-03-04 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Education Committee (0678S.05C) |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee |
2015-01-27 | Senate | S First Read--SB 328-Schupp |