MO SB33 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-18 - Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-18 - Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals a provision of law which requires the Department of Transportation to submit to binding arbitration in negligence actions
Title
Repeals a provision of law which requires the Department of Transportation to submit to binding arbitration in negligence actions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-18 | Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) | |
2011-04-18 | Reported Do Pass H Judiciary Committee | |
2011-04-18 | Voted Do Pass H Judiciary Committee | |
2011-04-06 | Hearing Conducted H Judiciary Committee | |
2011-03-31 | Referred H Judiciary Committee | |
2011-02-28 | H Second Read | |
2011-02-24 | H First Read | |
2011-02-24 | S Third Read and Passed | |
2011-02-24 | Reported from S Ways & Means and Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor | |
2011-02-22 | Voted Do Pass S Ways & Means and Fiscal Oversight Committee | |
2011-02-24 | Hearing Conducted S Ways & Means and Fiscal Oversight Committee | |
2011-02-09 | Referred S Ways & Means and Fiscal Oversight Committee | |
2011-02-09 | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Perfected | |
2011-02-07 | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2011-02-01 | Reported from S Transportation Committee to Floor | |
2011-01-26 | Voted Do Pass S Transportation Committee | |
2011-01-19 | Hearing Conducted S Transportation Committee | |
2011-01-12 | Second Read and Referred S Transportation Committee | |
2011-01-05 | S First Read--SB 33-Stouffer | |
2010-12-01 | Prefiled |