MO SB376 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates "Old Drum" as the historical dog of the state of Missouri and "Jim the Wonder Dog" as Missouri's wonder dog
Title
Designates "Old Drum" as the historical dog of the state of Missouri and "Jim the Wonder Dog" as Missouri's wonder dog
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-12 - House - House: SB 376 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - House - House: SB 376 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 50 NV: 4 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - House - House: SB 376 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 50 NV: 4 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-23 | House | Signed by Governor |
2017-05-22 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2017-05-22 | House | Signed by House Speaker |
2017-05-22 | House | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2017-05-22 | House | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2017-05-12 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2017-05-12 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2017-05-08 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2017-05-08 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2017-05-03 | House | Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2017-05-03 | House | Reported Do Pass H General Laws |
2017-05-02 | House | Voted Do Pass H General Laws |
2017-05-01 | House | Hearing Conducted H General Laws |
2017-04-26 | House | Referred H General Laws |
2017-04-19 | House | H Second Read |
2017-04-18 | House | H First Read |
2017-04-13 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Perfected, as amended |
2017-04-11 | Senate | SA 1 S offered & adopted (Hoskins)--(1709S01.01S) |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Reported from S General Laws Committee |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Removed S Consent Calendar |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reported from S General Laws Committee - Consent |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S General Laws Committee - Consent vote adopted |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S General Laws Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S General Laws Committee |
2017-01-31 | Senate | S First Read--SB 376-Hoskins |