MO SB391 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to agricultural operations
Title
Modifies provisions relating to agricultural operations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-14 - House - House: SB 391 SBs FOR THIRD READING-INFORMAL (Y: 103 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House: SB 391 (*HSA 1 HA 1) SBs FOR THIRD READING-INFORMAL (Y: 104 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House: SB 391 (*HSA 1 HA 1) SBs FOR THIRD READING-INFORMAL (Y: 48 N: 101 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2019-05-14 - House - House: SB 391 (HA 1) SBs FOR THIRD READING-INFORMAL (Y: 108 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House: SB 391 (*HSA 1 HA 1) SBs FOR THIRD READING-INFORMAL (Y: 104 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House: SB 391 (*HSA 1 HA 1) SBs FOR THIRD READING-INFORMAL (Y: 48 N: 101 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2019-05-14 - House - House: SB 391 (HA 1) SBs FOR THIRD READING-INFORMAL (Y: 108 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | House | Signed by Governor |
2019-05-17 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2019-05-17 | House | Signed by House Speaker |
2019-05-17 | House | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2019-05-17 | House | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2019-05-14 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2019-05-14 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2019-05-14 | House | HA 1 H defeated |
2019-05-14 | House | HSA 1 for HA 1 H offered & defeated (Beck)--(2073S02.13H) |
2019-05-14 | House | HA 1 H offered (McCreery)--(2073S02.08H) |
2019-05-14 | House | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2019-05-09 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2019-05-09 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2019-05-08 | House | Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2019-05-08 | House | Reported Do Pass H Agriculture Policy |
2019-05-07 | House | Voted Do Pass H Agriculture Policy |
2019-05-07 | House | Hearing Conducted H Agriculture Policy |
2019-05-06 | House | Referred H Agriculture Policy |
2019-05-06 | House | H Second Read |
2019-05-02 | House | H First Read |
2019-05-02 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Perfected |
2019-04-29 | Senate | SS, as amended, S adopted |
2019-04-29 | Senate | SA 12 to SS S offered & adopted (Schupp)--(2073S02.43S) |
2019-04-29 | Senate | SA 11 to SS S offered & defeated (Arthur)--(2073S02.36S) |
2019-04-29 | Senate | SA 10 to SS S offered & defeated (Cierpiot)--(2073S02.38S) |
2019-04-29 | Senate | SA 9 to SS S withdrawn |
2019-04-29 | Senate | SA 1 to SA 9 to SS S offered & defeated (Sifton)--(2073S02.33S) |
2019-04-29 | Senate | SA 9 to SS S offered (Sifton)--(2073S02.32S) |
2019-04-29 | Senate | SA 8 to SS S offered & defeated (Nasheed)--(2073S02.34S) |
2019-04-29 | Senate | SA 7 to SS S offered & defeated (Nasheed)--(2073S02.35S) |
2019-04-29 | Senate | SA 6 to SS S offered & withdrawn (Nasheed)--(2073S02.03F) |
2019-04-29 | Senate | SA 5 to SS S offered & adopted (Nasheed)--(2073S02.02F) |
2019-04-29 | Senate | SA 4 to SS S offered & defeated (May)--(2073S02.01F) |
2019-04-29 | Senate | SSA 1 for SA 3 to SS S offered & adopted (Emery)--(2073S02.24S) |
2019-04-29 | Senate | SA 3 to SS S offered (Holsman)--(2073S02.19S) |
2019-04-29 | Senate | SA 2 to SS S withdrawn |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2019-04-16 | Senate | SA 2 to SS S offered (Holsman)--(2073S02.11S) |
2019-04-16 | Senate | SSA 1 for SA 1 to SS S offered & adopted (Hegeman)--(2073S02.16S) |
2019-04-16 | Senate | SA 1 to SA 1 to SS S offered & withdrawn (Schupp)--(2073S02.13S) |
2019-04-16 | Senate | SA 1 to SS S offered (Schupp)--(2073S02.12S) |
2019-04-16 | Senate | SS S offered (Bernskoetter)--(2073S.02F) |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Reported from S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2019-02-14 | Senate | S First Read--SB 391-Bernskoetter |