MO SB442 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-18 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 442-Stouffer, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-18 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 442-Stouffer, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes photo identification requirements for voting
Title
Establishes photo identification requirements for voting
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-18 | S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 442-Stouffer, with SCS | |
2012-02-08 | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2012-02-02 | Reported from S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee to Floor w/SCS | |
2012-01-23 | SCS Voted Do Pass S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee - (4292S.02C) | |
2012-01-17 | Hearing Conducted S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee | |
2012-01-05 | Second Read and Referred S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee | |
2012-01-04 | S First Read--SB 442-Stouffer | |
2011-12-01 | Prefiled |