MO SB454 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-18 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 454-Pearce, with SA 1 (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-18 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 454-Pearce, with SA 1 (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the elementary and secondary education funding formula
Title
Modifies the elementary and secondary education funding formula
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-18 | S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 454-Pearce, with SA 1 (pending) | |
2012-04-18 | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2012-04-18 | SA 1 S offered (Engler)--(4366S02.07S) | |
2012-04-17 | Reported from S Education Committee to Floor | |
2012-04-16 | Voted Do Pass S Education Committee | |
2012-04-16 | Committee Vote Reconsidered | |
2012-04-04 | Motion to vote bill do pass failed S Education Committee | |
2012-01-18 | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee | |
2012-01-05 | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee | |
2012-01-04 | S First Read--SB 454-Pearce | |
2011-12-01 | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/12info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=28 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/12info/pdf-bill/intro/SB454.pdf |