MO SB464 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 18 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-30 - Delivered to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 18 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-30 - Delivered to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the establishment and operation of health insurance exchanges in Missouri unless certain criteria are met
Title
Prohibits the establishment and operation of health insurance exchanges in Missouri unless certain criteria are met
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-30 | Delivered to Secretary of State | |
2012-05-30 | Signed by House Speaker | |
2012-05-30 | Signed by Senate President | |
2012-05-30 | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee | |
2012-05-18 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed | |
2012-05-18 | H Third Read and Passed | |
2012-05-18 | HA 1 H offered & defeated (Jones-63)--(4313S03.03H) | |
2012-05-17 | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee | |
2012-05-17 | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee | |
2012-05-16 | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee | |
2012-05-15 | Reported Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2012-05-10 | Voted Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2012-05-10 | Hearing Conducted H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2012-05-09 | Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) | |
2012-05-09 | Reported Do Pass H Health Insurance Committee | |
2012-05-08 | Voted Do Pass H Health Insurance Committee | |
2012-03-27 | Hearing Conducted H Health Insurance Committee | |
2012-02-21 | Referred H Health Insurance Committee | |
2012-02-06 | H Second Read | |
2012-02-02 | H First Read | |
2012-02-02 | S Third Read and Passed | |
2012-02-02 | Reported from S Ways & Means and Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor | |
2012-02-02 | Voted Do Pass S Ways & Means and Fiscal Oversight Committee | |
2012-01-25 | Referred S Ways & Means and Fiscal Oversight Committee | |
2012-01-25 | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee | |
2012-01-24 | Perfected | |
2012-01-24 | SS S adopted | |
2012-01-24 | SA 1 to SS S offered & defeated (Justus)--(4313S03.01S) | |
2012-01-24 | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2012-01-23 | SS S offered (Schaaf)--(4313S.03F) | |
2012-01-19 | Reported from S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee to Floor | |
2012-01-17 | Voted Do Pass S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee | |
2012-01-10 | Hearing Conducted S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee | |
2012-01-05 | Second Read and Referred S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee | |
2012-01-04 | S First Read--SB 464-Schaaf | |
2011-12-01 | Prefiled |