MO SB469 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-15 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 469-Munzlinger
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-15 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 469-Munzlinger
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals the Advisory Council to the Director of the Missouri Agriculture Experiment Station and establishes the Fertilizer Control Board
Title
Repeals the Advisory Council to the Director of the Missouri Agriculture Experiment Station and establishes the Fertilizer Control Board
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-15 | Senate | S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 469-Munzlinger |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Reported from S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee to Floor |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2015-02-19 | Senate | S First Read--SB 469-Munzlinger |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/15info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=3985609 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/15info/pdf-bill/intro/SB469.pdf |