MO SB484 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-10 - HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-10 - HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to telecommunications
Title
Modifies provisions relating to telecommunications
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-10 | HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2012-05-10 | Hearing Conducted H Rules Purusant Committee | |
2012-05-02 | Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) | |
2012-05-02 | HCS Reported Do Pass H Utilities Committee | |
2012-05-01 | HCS Voted Do Pass H Utilities Committee | |
2012-05-01 | Hearing Conducted H Utilities Committee | |
2012-04-12 | Referred H Utilities Committee | |
2012-02-27 | H Second Read | |
2012-02-23 | H First Read | |
2012-02-23 | S Third Read and Passed | |
2012-02-22 | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee | |
2012-02-22 | Perfected | |
2012-02-22 | SCS, as amended, S adopted | |
2012-02-22 | SA 1 to SCS S offered & adopted (Crowell)--(4252S04.01S) | |
2012-02-15 | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2012-02-09 | Reported from S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee to Floor w/SCS | |
2012-02-07 | SCS Voted Do Pass (w/SCS SBs 484, 477 & 606 ) S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee - (4252S.04C) | |
2012-02-07 | Committee Vote Reconsidered | |
2012-01-24 | SCS Voted Do Pass (w/ SCS SBs 484 & 477) S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee - (4252S.03C) | |
2012-01-18 | Hearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee | |
2012-01-05 | Second Read and Referred S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee | |
2012-01-04 | S First Read--SB 484-Rupp | |
2011-12-01 | Prefiled |