MO SB524 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-22 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-22 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to contractual fees charged by certain financial institutions
Title
Modifies provisions relating to contractual fees charged by certain financial institutions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-22 | House | Signed by Governor |
2015-05-27 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2015-05-27 | House | Signed by House Speaker Pro Tem |
2015-05-27 | House | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2015-05-27 | House | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee |
2015-04-29 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2015-04-29 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2015-04-27 | House | Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on Financial Institutions and Taxation (Pursuant to H Rule 27.6) |
2015-04-23 | House | Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on Financial Institutions and Taxation (Pursuant to H Rule 27.6) |
2015-04-20 | House | Referred H Select Committee on Financial Institutions and Taxation (Pursuant to H Rule 27.6) Committee |
2015-04-20 | House | Reported Do Pass H Banking Committee |
2015-04-20 | House | Voted Do Pass H Banking Committee |
2015-04-20 | House | Hearing Conducted H Banking Committee |
2015-04-15 | House | Referred H Banking Committee |
2015-04-14 | House | H Second Read |
2015-04-13 | House | H First Read |
2015-04-13 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Perfected |
2015-04-08 | Senate | SA 1 S Ruled Out of Order |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Point of order beyond the scope - taken under advisement |
2015-04-08 | Senate | SA 1 S offered (Schupp)--(2334S01.01S) |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Reported from S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee to Floor |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee |
2015-02-25 | Senate | S First Read--SB 524-Cunningham |